Financial history BELMONT ABBEY GENERAL TRUST

Charity number: 226278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.31m £517.43k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £847.39k £6.65m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.05k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £610.40k £173.14k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £276.38k £150.10k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £38.07k £13.36k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £272.63k £152.88k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £112.82k £27.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £411.68k £85.51k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £508.01k £283.69k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £339.38k £104.27k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £22.35k £41.87k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £8.07k £6.23k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £6.27m N/A N/A N/A