Financial history ROYAL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 226545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.85m £5.24m £5.28m £7.08m £5.16m
Total expenditure £4.53m £4.46m £4.73m £5.28m £4.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.59k £13.49k £14.80k £10.00k £18.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £36.06k £173.69k £16.33k £12.17k £28.07k
Income - Other trading activities £40.26k £25.69k £9.31k £13.18k £14.37k
Income - Charitable activities £4.60m £4.83m £5.00m £6.63m £4.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.25k
Income - Investment £173.89k £203.97k £252.03k £429.59k £505.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.00k £173.03k £12.32k £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.52m £4.45m £4.69m £5.26m £4.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.25k £8.16k £42.31k £19.61k £11.64k
Expenditure - Governance £177.29k £123.33k £153.11k £161.24k £186.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £263.09k £83.74k £178.41k £252.51k £257.98k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0