Trustees ROYAL ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 226545

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor James Wild | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Professor Paul Crowther | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Karen Anne Devoil | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Peel | Trustee | 09 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Chrysa Avdellidou | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Arvind Parmar | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Prof Matthew Griffin | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Iain Hannah | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Young | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Prof Michael Lockwood | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor James Hammond | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Andrew Curtis | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Imogen Gingell | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Derek Ward-Thompson | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Ashley Spindler | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alan Cayless | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Stephen Eales | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Caroline Smith | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheona Urquhart | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Prof Mark Lester | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Prof Steven Miller | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.