Accounts and annual returns SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY AND RYEDALE MIND

Charity number: 226729
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 26 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 February 2011 9 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 24 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 04 January 2010 On Time