Financial history SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY AND RYEDALE MIND

Charity number: 226729
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £238.97k £137.57k £205.21k £189.24k £0
Total expenditure £227.80k £187.94k £233.24k £219.12k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A