Financial history ST MARY MAGDALEN AND ST JOHN THE BAPTIST CHAPELS CHARITY

Charity number: 227085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £21.95k £32.07k £8.02k £8.01k £16.50k
Total expenditure £6.37k £48.88k £9.58k £7.25k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A