Financial history RANWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 227618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.94k £10.37k £936 £10.85k £10.85k
Total expenditure £8.76k £3.68k £3.91k £10.95k £10.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A