Financial history HASELBURY PLUCKNETT (SOMERSET) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 227699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £470 £76 £389 £1.60k £1.26k
Total expenditure £606 £343 £718 £1.37k £1.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A