STRODE PARK FOUNDATION FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide care and support to meet the changing and individual needs of people with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,844,056
Donations and legacies | £76.07k | |
Charitable activities | £11.52m | |
Other trading activities | £178.31k | |
Investments | £3.28k | |
Other | £65.84k |
Total expenditure:
£13,520,204
Raising funds | £114.98k | |
Charitable activities | £13.41m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,503,061 from 87 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £114.98k | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.41m |
People

353 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- STRODE PARK FOUNDATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- STRODE PARK FOUNDATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Toms | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Greer | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Abel | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Wallden | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Clayson | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Hyner | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Garrod | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Allaway | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Russell Clark | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40m | £11.74m | £11.96m | £11.83m | £11.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.44m | £10.93m | £11.30m | £12.12m | £13.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.68m | £7.61m | £7.98m | £7.50m | £8.50m | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.21k | £843.38k | £319.04k | £8.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £251.59k | £112.94k | £121.63k | £188.48k | £76.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £237.81k | £105.48k | £200.13k | £237.36k | £178.31k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.84m | £10.64m | £11.24m | £11.36m | £11.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.15k | £835 | £602 | £1.73k | £3.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £61.92k | £31.51k | £398.85k | £45.64k | £65.84k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £143.76k | £4.00k | £66.09k | £125.00k | £60.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.19m | £10.74m | £10.95m | £11.83m | £13.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £249.50k | £189.74k | £346.19k | £290.48k | £114.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £96.08k | £93.98k | £116.57k | £123.10k | £23.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.54m | £5.60m | £5.51m | £5.60m | £5.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £173.61k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.08m | £2.63m | £3.21m | £2.81m | £2.02m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£865.92k | -£882.36k | -£712.33k | -£9.77k | -£4.57k | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.61m | £2.24m | £2.06m | £1.76m | £2.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/04/1946 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 SEP 2016 as amended on 27 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A HOME FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND TREATMENT FOR PERSONS TOTALLY OR PARTIALLY DISABLED. HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR SAME AND REHABILITATION AND EMPLOYMENT BY INSTRUCTION IN TRADES AND CRAFTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STRODE PARK HOUSE
HERNE
HERNE BAY
KENT
CT6 7NE
- Phone:
- 01227373292
- Email:
- info@strodepark.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window