Financial history GWYNEDD (CAERNARFON) FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity Number: 228500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.21k £12.32k £17.50k £17.38k £17.58k
Total expenditure £18.55k £10.31k £15.28k £16.48k £17.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.26k N/A N/A N/A N/A