THE PIRBRIGHT INSTITUTE

Charity number: 228824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To conduct and promote scientific research on infectious diseases of farm animals, including exotic diseases and to develop appropriate methods for their control; and on matters concerned with animal health and ancillary thereto, and to publish the results of such research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE INSTITUTE FOR ANIMAL HEALTH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Norris Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Dr Ian Walker Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Dr Tim Harry Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Michael Tsang Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Tamsin Webster Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Dr Linda Magee OBE Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Professor Charles Michael Turner Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Professor Deenan Pillay Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Alison Hardy Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Paul Logan Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Professor Vince Emery Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.08m £80.68m £59.11m £46.86m £44.67m
Total expenditure £45.58m £48.00m £46.52m £50.60m £54.99m
Income from government contracts N/A £70.72m N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants £48.89m £7.07m £49.85m £37.07m £27.72m
Income - Donations and legacies £15.45m £18.93m £15.51m £18.62m £19.85m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.61m £1.45m £1.94m £1.57m
Income - Charitable activities £41.53m £58.19m £41.19m £25.01m £21.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.05m £956.00k £959.00k £1.29m £1.88m
Income - Other £2.05m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £45.56m £47.98m £46.50m £50.58m £54.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.00k £18.00k £19.00k £22.00k £24.00k
Expenditure - Governance £38.00k £90.00k £96.00k £137.00k £74.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.00k £18.00k £19.00k £22.00k £24.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £267.98m £295.17m £318.23m £319.78m £316.66m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £2.00m £2.15m £2.37m
Other assets £47.71m £56.09m £45.57m £39.88m £33.17m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £17.73m £20.62m £20.56m £20.16m £20.66m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Pirbright Institute
Ash Road
Pirbright
WOKING
Surrey
GU24 0NF
Phone:
01483232441