Financial history SPALDING RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 229268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £39.96k £36.08k £41.19k £45.30k £47.07k
Total expenditure £32.12k £32.40k £37.29k £52.87k £47.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A