WATNALL (NOTTS) WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 229273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Monthly meeting of members providing speakers, craft activities and social events in the Watnall area of Nottingham. Also a hall for activities for the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £14,258
Total expenditure: £11,990

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WATNALL W I (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOYCE WIDDOWSON Chair
None on record
Marilyn Mason Mrs Trustee 22 November 2019
None on record
JANET STONE Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record
JANET BARKER Trustee 22 October 2016
None on record
Dr Helen Patience Rose Trustee
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES
Received: On time
MARION ELIZABETH MONKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £16.32k £19.59k £9.53k £15.09k £14.26k
Total expenditure £11.62k £10.73k £15.11k £10.65k £11.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Bass Close
Linby
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 8JW
Phone:
01159634572
Email:
No information available