Financial history GARTHGWYNION CHARITIES

Charity number: 229334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £63.22k £52.61k £52.37k £57.25k £65.56k
Total expenditure £93.98k £66.71k £73.49k £63.56k £4.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A