Trustees YORK CIVIC TRUST
Charity Number: 229336

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Delma Joan Tomlin | Chair | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LESLEY PALMER | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Roy Neil Wallington | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Fernyhough Thompson | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Roger Woolley | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Seddon | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Dobson | Trustee | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WEBB | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Wendy Constance Bundy | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Prof Anthony Dormer May | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Ann Elizabeth Margaret Heaps | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ERIC LUSTY | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Scott | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.