Trustees THE CUCKFIELD COTTAGE HOMES TRUST
Charity number: 229475

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DANIEL JAMES VALENTINE | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy John Howell | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Edmonston | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN CHARLES GAIMSTER | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR TERRY BEVAN | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|||||
CAROLYN MARION PETITPIERRE | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.