Financial history THE BRITISH AIRLINE PILOTS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 229957
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £42.25k £51.59k £51.93k £47.56k £284.16k
Total expenditure £30.55k £83.54k £77.46k £64.85k £90.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A