Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - AUGHTON

Charity Number: 230248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £13.86k £19.76k £4.67k £4.00k £3.50k
Total expenditure £11.20k £5.75k £2.70k £2.59k £2.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A