Financial history WINDSOR MENCAP

Charity number: 230318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.45k £250 £68.35k £3.90k £4.83k
Total expenditure £5.88k £3.13k £3.95k £6.89k £11.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A