WINDSOR MENCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides welfare advocacy and other services to people with learning disability. Also provides a clubhouse for use by its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 06 March 1964: Standard registration
- WINDSOR SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- WINDSOR SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER GERRARD VERMEULEN -HOLDING- | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE LYNNE KIRK - HOLDING | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANNE CLARKE -HOLDING- | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Trevor Dworkin | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||
KEVIN PAUL DEMPSEY | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE RICHARDS -HOLDING- | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | £250 | £68.35k | £3.90k | £4.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.88k | £3.13k | £3.95k | £6.89k | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH FEBRUARY 1964 AS AMENDED 17TH MARCH 1980 AND 2ND DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE NEW WINDSOR AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yellowstocks
Horton Road
Stanwell Moor
Staines upon Thames
Surrey
TW19 6AE
- Phone:
- 07730487435
- Email:
- Suz.kirk@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window