DAWSON'S COTTAGES

Charity number: 231087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides accommodation in accordance with the provisions of the Dawson Trust

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £31,266
Total expenditure: £17,536

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Stuart Ing Chair 04 November 2021
BARNARD CASTLE AND MARWOOD WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
Irene Valerie Ewart Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Dr John Jackson White Trustee 01 March 2022
DURHAM DALES PARISH NURSING
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH BARNARD CASTLE
Received: On time
Ailsa McKenzie Trustee 20 January 2022
THE BROUGH MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Karen McSkimming Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
Dr Michael Richard McLean Trustee 17 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.64k £19.15k £23.97k £32.14k £31.27k
Total expenditure £53.69k £12.07k £17.47k £44.93k £17.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
84 Montalbo Road
Barnard Castle
Co.Durham
DL12 8BP
Phone:
01833637594
Website:

No information available