Trustees THE ENGLISH STAGE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity Number: 231242
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY CHARLES BURTON CBE Chair
THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Ravenhill Trustee 07 April 2024
None on record
Neal Ghandi Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Pamela Jikiemi Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
Mwenya Kawesha Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
ANDREW CHARLES JAMES RODGER Trustee 28 June 2018
UK FRIENDS OF THE MUSTIQUE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Mahdi Yahya Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record
LORD STEWART WOOD Trustee
None on record
JENNETTE ARNOLD OBE Trustee
None on record
ANITA SCOTT Trustee
None on record