Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF ST ANNES ON THE SEA - BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 231290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.24k £3.40k £2.86k £7.03k £4.84k
Total expenditure £2.90k £3.88k £3.43k £4.86k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A