THE FRIENDS OF CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds for the benefit of Crowborough Hospital, its patients and staff; maintain a hospital shop, operate a Social Day Service at the Hospital Day Centre, and provide transport through 2 wheelchair accessible vehicles utilising volunteer drivers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Genevieve Gresset | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Hathaway | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Douglas Stanley Phillips | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Martin Shaw | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Eileen Lane | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kay Moss | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.43k | £40.49k | £169.03k | £55.23k | £245.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.82k | £21.68k | £44.95k | £111.34k | £44.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 1859 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 23 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE HAVING FOR ITS OBJECT THEWELFARE OF THE CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL, THE PATIENTS THEREIN, OR THE MEDICAL OR NURSING OR DOMESTIC STAFF OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
CROWBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OFFICE
CROWBOROUGH HOSPITAL
SOUTH VIEW ROAD
CROWBOROUGH
EAST SUSSEX
TN6 1HB
- Phone:
- 01892664626
- Email:
- enquiries@foch.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window