INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL PATHOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is the publication of the Journal. Our policy is to publish research into the cause, diagnosis and cure of disease in man. Any profits from such publication are used to promote research in this field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL PATHOLOGY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Lauder Professor | Chair |
|
||||||||
Professor Helen Lachmann | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Robert David Goldin | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Gillian Murphy | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR MALCOLM ALISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.95k | £70.16k | £69.34k | £80.05k | £88.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66k | £184.31k | £16.21k | £45.84k | £22.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11/8/1939 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE SCIENTIFIC KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATON IN PATHOLOGY AND SUBJECTS ALLIED THERTO AND TO CARRY ON THE PUBLICATION OF THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL PATHOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Pheasants Way
Rickmansworth
WD3 7ES
- Phone:
- 01923720253
- Email:
- d.katz@ucl.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window