BATH DISABILITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO DISABLED PERSONS AND TO ALLEVIATE THE EFFECT OF DISABILITY WITHIN BATH AND ITS CONTIGUOUS PARISHES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 22 February 1968: Standard registration
- BATH ASSOCIATION FOR DISABLED PEOPLE (Previous name)
- BATH ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN ROGERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Enid Sivyour | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CARLYLE HUGHESDON | Trustee | 16 July 2012 |
|
|||||
MARY COATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE MOOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELSIE ANN BARBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
mike way | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.39k | £37.41k | £37.47k | £44.50k | £47.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.15k | £21.51k | £40.16k | £54.55k | £65.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/03/1963 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/1968 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/1992 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO DISABLED PERSONS AND TO ALLEVIATE THE EFFECT OF SUCH DISABILITY WITHIN BATH AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
BATH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 NAPIER ROAD
BATH
BA1 4LN
- Phone:
- 01225315647
- Email:
- mary-coath@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
BathDisabilitytrust.webplus.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window