Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - BEDFORD BRANCH

Charity number: 231568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.92k £43.62k £7.82k £20.00k £9.81k
Total expenditure £36.36k £49.17k £4.20k £19.00k £11.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A