Financial history CHESTER PLUS

Charity number: 231770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.26k £9.33k £4.66k £0 £1.13k
Total expenditure £10.29k £6.64k £2.25k £349 £351
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A