Financial history THE COMMUNITY OF THE RESURRECTION

Charity Number: 232670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.75m £1.56m £1.44m £1.43m £1.80m
Total expenditure £1.68m £1.59m £1.79m £2.11m £1.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £87.27k £105.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £740.00k £727.00k £501.00k £370.00k £442.00k
Income - Other trading activities £37.00k £31.00k £76.00k £108.00k £124.00k
Income - Charitable activities £705.00k £584.00k £578.00k £615.00k £734.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £267.00k £220.00k £284.00k £337.00k £360.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £136.00k
Income - Legacies £134.00k £282.00k £178.00k £58.00k £149.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.44m £1.40m £1.60m £1.89m £1.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £243.00k £190.00k £187.00k £215.00k £205.00k
Expenditure - Governance £17.00k £17.00k £9.00k £20.00k £501.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.00k £14.00k £19.00k £15.00k £5.59k
Expenditure - Investment management £128.00k £89.00k £74.00k £108.00k £91.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0