Financial history THE COUNTESS OF HUNTINGDON'S CONNEXION

Charity number: 232674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £381.59k £321.11k £447.94k £369.41k £521.67k
Total expenditure £385.95k £331.30k £354.68k £430.92k £485.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £404.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.28k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £87.79k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £457.44k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.72k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £39.67k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0