THE HARDING FUND

Charity number: 233080
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making small grants to individuals when faced with an un-scheduled expenditure, also to charitable organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £6
Total expenditure: £450

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALDERMAN JOHN FREDERICK LANDERS Chair
None on record
MR STEWART LITTLEFAIR Trustee
None on record
KENNETH ALEXANDER MCALEER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £98 £27 £18 £28 £6
Total expenditure £1.30k £500 £200 £450 £450
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
212 LYNMOUTH AVENUE
MORDEN
SM4 4RP
Phone:
02083301972
Website:

No information available