Financial history THE WILLIAM CHESTER ESTATE CHARITY

Charity number: 233327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.33k £11.41k £11.54k £12.24k £12.72k
Total expenditure £10.14k £10.15k £10.19k £10.25k £10.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A