Financial history THE OXFORD BACH CHOIR

Charity number: 233688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £103.50k £43.74k £91.93k £129.64k £168.33k
Total expenditure £68.45k £30.28k £116.66k £132.69k £898.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A