Financial history THE WILLIE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 233731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.38k £34.50k £35.44k £38.83k £41.53k
Total expenditure £66.13k £31.00k £15.19k £21.64k £37.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A