Governing document THE WILLIE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2015 as amended on 21 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF SIX ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED POOR OF THE PARISH OF GREAT TOTHAM. THREE OF SUCH ALMSHOUSES TO BE OCCUPIED BY WIDOWS AND THREE BY MARRIED COUPLES ALL OF WHOM HAVE RESIDED IN THE PARISH FOR 20 YEARS. SCHOOL ROOM FOR THE USE OF LECTURES AND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
GREAT TOTHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.