Financial history NORTHAMPTON ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity Number: 234091
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £9.56m £9.17m £7.69m £7.74m £7.76m
Total expenditure £9.03m £9.42m £6.36m £6.21m £8.43m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.38k £532.24k £152.38k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.54m £6.10m £5.42m £5.63m £6.08m
Income - Other trading activities £796.20k £909.48k £286.46k £375.75k £445.02k
Income - Charitable activities £262.90k £305.46k £612.33k £519.79k £291.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £852.21k £940.87k £586.98k £735.46k £944.83k
Income - Other £113.82k £905.68k £787.64k £481.42k £0
Income - Legacies £1.57m £374.86k £892.63k £378.78k £186.66k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.79m £9.13m £6.18m £6.07m £8.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £234.06k £288.96k £186.55k £145.30k £188.53k
Expenditure - Governance £31.38k £31.09k £43.13k £35.33k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £577.44k £600.47k £0 £327.57k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £52.50k £56.30k £53.27k £51.42k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0