Financial history PHILIP METCALFE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 234453
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.75k £18.82k £9.56k £19.06k £114.46k
Total expenditure £28.78k £12.84k £11.22k £28.39k £165.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £94.22k