LANHYDROCK WAR MEMORIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of meeting place for benefit of community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

19 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 17 August 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS HOSKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ian Cameron Holding | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Miller | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV Roger May | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Damon Bayley | Trustee | 12 May 2015 |
|
|||||
HEATHER HOSKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAPHNE LYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN COODE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY HOSKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONICA BAYLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHELIA HOSKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAY HIGGINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL HOSKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH MAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA SANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PERCY COAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE TREVAINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £15.32k | £7.91k | £24.40k | £15.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.63k | £9.79k | £2.70k | £23.72k | £22.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 924 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 924 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 30TH MAY 1922
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PREMISES FOR SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RELIGIOUS PURPOSES IN THE PARISH OF LANHYDROCK.
Area of benefit
LANHYDROCK CP
Contact information
- Address:
-
MYRTLE COTTAGE
MAUDLIN
BODMIN
PL30 5AH
- Phone:
- 01208872115
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window