THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM (THE ORDER OF ST JOHN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Order of St John is a major international charity, accredited to the United Nations, whose organisations- together widely known as St John - provide first aid, health care and support services in over 35 countries around the world. The Order's charitable work is carried out by the St John Eye Hospital in Jerusalem and St John Establishments worldwide- with volunteers and staff of over 300,000.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,559,513
Donations and legacies | £3.33m | |
Charitable activities | £103.38k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £125.65k | |
Other | £189 |
Total expenditure:
£1,528,963
Raising funds | £37.52k | |
Charitable activities | £1.49m | |
Other | £0 |
£143,385 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £103,376 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.49m | |
Retained for future use | £2.03m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £37.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.49m | |
Retained for future use | £2.17m |
People

11 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Barbados
- Bermuda
- Canada
- Cyprus
- Dominica
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Grenada
- Guernsey
- Guyana
- Hong Kong
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Jamaica
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- St Lucia
- Tanzania
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 September 1964: Standard registration
- 26 November 1999: Removed (Duplicate registration)
- THE ORDER OF ST JOHN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Rozario | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mutula | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Anderson | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Whitehead | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Budd | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Stuart Shilson LVO GCStJ | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steven Alan Evans | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Andrew John Cash OBE | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Raymond Compton AM | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RT REVEREND TIMOTHY JOHN STEVENS | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48m | £1.29m | £1.26m | £1.88m | £3.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34m | £1.16m | £1.16m | £1.49m | £1.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £102.13k | £103.18k | £96.46k | £105.90k | £103.38k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.21m | £1.02m | £1.01m | £1.67m | £3.33m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £161.17k | £136.64k | £96.46k | £105.90k | £103.38k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £116.80k | £132.07k | £128.47k | £111.67k | £125.65k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £27.32k | £0 | £189 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £160.38k | £27.32k | £13.89k | £273.93k | £1.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.27m | £1.07m | £1.08m | £1.44m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £68.34k | £62.60k | £69.03k | £51.12k | £37.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £94.34k | £101.47k | £88.88k | £219.87k | £268.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £499.29k | £438.92k | £365.47k | £440.07k | £364.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £29.09k | £12.62k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.02m | £2.01m | £1.99m | £1.95m | £1.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.25m | £2.41m | £2.69m | £2.57m | £2.67m | |
|
Other assets | £1.95m | £2.11m | £1.96m | £2.42m | £4.50m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £36.34k | £57.84k | £68.46k | £89.22k | £72.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER, 1955 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 6TH MARCH 1974 AND STATUTES AS AMENDED ON 9TH FEBRUARY 1993, 2ND NOVEMBER 1994, 23RD NOVEMBER 1995 AND 21ST JULY 1999 AND 17 DECEMBER 2002 (BUT NOT TAKING EFFECT UNTIL 1 JANUARY 2004) as amended by an Order in Council on 25 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE ALL WORKS OF HUMANITY AND CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN SICKNESS, DISTRESS, SUFFERING OR DANGER, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, CLASS OR CREED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 17 September 1964 : Standard registration
- 26 November 1999 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Order of St. John
3 Charterhouse Mews
LONDON
EC1M 6BB
- Phone:
- 02072513292
- Email:
- info@orderofstjohn.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window