CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to people in need living in the parish of Ottringham (East Yorkshire).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 06 November 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM HOUSTON | Chair | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Laraine Hilton | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Alexander Ogilvie BA Hons | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Alisdair Laird | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Simon Morgan Dundee | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tudor Williams | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ROBERTA BILLANEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY FAIRWEATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERNIE OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.06k | £11.07k | £11.11k | £11.19k | £11.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.86k | £13.20k | £23.22k | £19.21k | £18.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DIVIDED INTO TWO EQUAL PARTS: 1. ONE HALF TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR APPLICATION IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH AND OF THE FURNITURE THEREOF. 2. THE REMAINING HALF FOR RELIEF IN NEED RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF OTTRINGHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONSOF DISTRESS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 28 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OTTRINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTH FIELD
CHAPEL LANE
OTTRINGHAM
HULL
HU12 0AA
- Phone:
- 01964626908
- Email:
- mfairweather515@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window