Financial history SHROPSHIRE YEOMANRY COMRADES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 237251
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £2.07k £3.96k £3.15k £14.28k
Total expenditure £3.42k £1.27k £2.37k £2.26k £12.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A