Trustees THE BENTLEY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 237289

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew John Boyes | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY FRANCIS MAY | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Veronica Chissell | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Edwards | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Goodyear | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Davies | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.