MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain the Village Hall for the communal benefit of the residents of Binfield Village and its surrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 07 December 1964: Standard registration
- BINFIELD MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Hatt | Chair | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David John Knight | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Peacey | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
John Hywel Anderson | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Okeeffe | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Kindeleit | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ethel Edgington | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart John Wharpshire | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Pettitt | Trustee | 14 June 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.56k | £13.15k | £13.18k | £17.22k | £18.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.15k | £8.43k | £10.53k | £10.68k | £10.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2023 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20TH MARCH 1962
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BINFIELD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
BINFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Binfield Memorial Hall
Terrace Road South
Binfield
Berkshire
RG42 4DS
- Phone:
- 07702848735
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window