Financial history THE THOROTON SOCIETY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE

Charity Number: 237755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.64k £17.82k £14.50k £17.72k £18.45k
Total expenditure £31.49k £18.07k £16.09k £28.11k £24.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A