Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - STURMINSTER NEWTON AND GILLINGHAM BRANCH

Charity number: 238483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.76k £6.61k £6.04k £4.28k £5.64k
Total expenditure £4.29k £6.63k £6.41k £846 £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A