THE SUSSEX CATTLE SOCIETY (FORMERLY THE SUSSEX HERD BOOK SOCIETY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining Herd Book of the Sussex Cattle Breed Promotion of the Sussex Cattle Breed Advising on the Sussex Cattle Breed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM PETERS | Chair | 06 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Simon Clive Wright | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JUSTIN HARMER | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Spanton | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Horsman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John David Hickman | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN HURLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Harmer | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donald Walter Masters | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Howard | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Louise Hide | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEVENS | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HICKMAN | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROGER STEWART DUNN | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES HOLDSTOCK | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GAYE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.61k | £59.08k | £62.22k | £64.59k | £63.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.39k | £41.69k | £60.64k | £58.03k | £76.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH MARCH 1890 AND LICENCE OF THE BOARD OF TRADE DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1962 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1ST MARCH 1977 as amended on 20 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE PURITY AND IMPROVE THE BREED OF SUSSEX CATTLE, AND TO DO ALL SUCH FURTHER ACTS AND THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THAT COBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUSSEX CATTLE SOCIETY
STATION ROAD
ROBERTSBRIDGE
TN32 5DG
- Phone:
- 01580880105
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window