CHARITY OF THE REVEREND H D WYATT

Charity number: 238953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help the needy of Normandy at the current incumbents disgression

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev George Albion Watkinson Trustee 01 February 2023
THE LEMPRIERE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE PIRBRIGHT RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 July 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 May 2023 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2023 741 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Mark's Church Hall Office
Guildford Road
Guildford
GU3 2DA
Phone:
01483 811777
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available