Financial history KIRKBYMOORSIDE AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 239063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/12/2019 06/12/2020 06/12/2021 06/12/2022 06/12/2023
Total gross income £1.17k £1.22k £1.24k £1.36k £1.31k
Total expenditure £1.23k £1.05k £0 £1.35k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A