Financial history JANE ELIZABETH LAMBERT

Charity number: 239690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.12k £2.12k £2.12k £2.14k £2.41k
Total expenditure £1.35k £2.80k £1.25k £961 £2.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A