Financial history THE POOR'S ALLOTMENTS CHARITY

Charity number: 240164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £4.33k £3.31k £15.53k £15.60k £3.22k
Total expenditure £900 £3.36k £2.33k £2.96k £2.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A